+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Lieutenant Governor
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 2
- House/ uncircled
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2015: House/ floor amendment # 2
February 10, 2015: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 10, 2015: House/ uncircled
February 9, 2015: House/ circled
February 4, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor