+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Lieutenant Governor
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ read 2nd time
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 5
January 26, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor