+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (10)
March 13, 2019: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 6
March 12, 2019: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
March 12, 2019: Senate/ uncircled
March 12, 2019: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 9
March 12, 2019: Senate/ circled
March 4, 2019: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 5
March 4, 2019: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 5
February 15, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 4
February 5, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
February 5, 2019: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor