+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Lieutenant Governor
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 9, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 1, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 25, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor