+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ lifted from Rules
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 26, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2018: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor