+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 9, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor