+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- House Failed
- House Amended
- House Read 3rd Time
- House Rules Comm to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House Under Suspension of the Rules
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Comm
- House Substituted
- House Read 3rd Time
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm Report Favorable
- House Read 2nd Time
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Standing Committee
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- House Received Fiscal Note from Fiscal
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from General Counsel
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Vote
February 27, 2003: House Failed
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor