+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On March 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 29, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2005: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 4
February 22, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor