+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
February 10, 2011: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor