+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House/ 2nd reading
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment 2
Passed
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2022: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 14, 2022: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 6
February 14, 2022: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 6
February 14, 2022: House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 6
February 14, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor