+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- House Filed
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/enacting clause struck
- Senate/to House
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/received from House
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Senate
- House Passed 3rd Reading
- House Read 3rd Time
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- House Rules Comm to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House Under Suspension of the Rules
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Comm
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Comm Report Favorable
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- House Received Fiscal Note from Fiscal
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Standing Committee
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Vote
February 27, 2003: House Passed 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor