+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 23, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor