+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Lieutenant Governor
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ read 2nd time
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 18, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 15, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On December 5, 2006 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 17, 2006 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Vote
January 18, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor