+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 6, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Lieutenant Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 29, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 14, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 10, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 20, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Vote
February 2, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor