+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Lieutenant Governor
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 21, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
February 9, 2011: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
January 31, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
January 26, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 9
January 24, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor