+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House/ held
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 16, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 10, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor