+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ to House
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Lifted from Table
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Tabled
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 2016: Senate Comm - Tabled
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2016: House/ uncircled
February 29, 2016: House/ circled
February 19, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor