+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
February 14, 2019: House/ floor amendment # 1
February 14, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 3
February 5, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor