+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Lieutenant Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House/ read 2nd time
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ comm rpt fav/ substituted/ Consent
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 7, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 27, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
February 20, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 17, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor