+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
- Senate/ to House
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Rules Committee
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On January 9, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 30, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 29, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 2
Prepared
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (2)
January 26, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 6
January 22, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor