+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor