+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ substitute/ amended/ Consent
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment # 1
Prepared
Senate Amendment # 4
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
March 1, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 59
- Absent: 16
February 20, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor