+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 28, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Vote
February 21, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor