+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Lieutenant Governor
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
March 9, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor