+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Comm/ amended
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 28, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 9
February 13, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor