+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Vote
February 12, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor