+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Lieutenant Governor
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ uncircled
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 22, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 21, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
January 31, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 61
- Absent: 14
January 18, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor