+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ to House
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 1
March 7, 2016: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
March 3, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor