+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 26, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 24, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor