+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ to House
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ filed
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ recalled by Senate
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ motion to reconsider failed
- Senate/ to House
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ filed
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2018: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 5
March 5, 2018: House/ floor amendment # 1
March 5, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2018: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor