+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ to Senate
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 12, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
February 10, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
January 25, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor