+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to House
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ held for reconsideration
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (5)
March 7, 2011: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 15, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor