+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (9)
February 29, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 7
February 26, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
February 26, 2016: Senate/ circled
February 26, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
February 25, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
February 25, 2016: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
February 22, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 5, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
February 2, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor