+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ held
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
February 22, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 5
February 17, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
February 8, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
February 8, 2017: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
January 30, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor