+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 13, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
February 7, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor