+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
March 7, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor