+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ failed
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
February 16, 2021: House/ failed
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 45
- Absent: 3
February 16, 2021: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 8, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 4
February 8, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor