+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ substituted
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ Rules to calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 24, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 19, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 12, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 12, 2009: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor