+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 27, 2018 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
February 13, 2019: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 12, 2019: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 6, 2019: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 6, 2019: Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 6, 2019: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 29, 2019: House/ uncircled
January 29, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
January 29, 2019: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
January 28, 2019: House/ circled
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor