+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- House/ substituted by Rules
- House/ to standing committee
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 29, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On December 17, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 5
February 16, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor