+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 27, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 9, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 4