+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 4
February 24, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor