+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Vote
February 18, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor