+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ held
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (10)
March 6, 2017: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2017: Senate/ uncircled
March 3, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
March 3, 2017: Senate/ circled
March 2, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 22, 2017: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 22, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 15, 2017: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 15, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 1, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor