+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ received from Senate
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ to Senate
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Senate
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 12, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2009: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
March 12, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
March 2, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor