+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 1
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 22, 2015 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 21, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
March 2, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 9
February 25, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
February 18, 2016: House/ floor amendment # 1
February 18, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
February 8, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor