+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ received from House
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 3 to # 4
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 2 to # 3
- House/ floor amendment # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Floor Amendment 2
Passed
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (12)
February 25, 2019: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 22, 2019: Senate/ uncircled
February 22, 2019: Senate/ circled
February 22, 2019: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2019: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 14, 2019: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 14, 2019: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 3 to # 4
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 11, 2019: House/ floor amendment # 1
February 11, 2019: House/ substituted from # 2 to # 3
February 11, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 75
January 31, 2019: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
January 31, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor