+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2005: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 14, 2005: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 59
- Absent: 16
February 2, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Rep. Lawrence, M. S.
Type:
Primary Sponsor