+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 17, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 12, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2006: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 7
March 1, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
February 20, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 13, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 3
January 30, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor