+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
- Senate/ to House
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 12, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (2)
February 14, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 5
February 10, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor